This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/22/2019 at 00:32:22 (UTC).

POAH CUTLER MANOR, LLC. VS. GRESHUNA WARREN

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 POAH CUTLER MANOR, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRESHUNA WARREN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POAH Cutler Manor, LLC.

Defendant

Warren, Greshuna

Not Classified By Court

Cutler Manor Apartments

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Costa, Brian C

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

02/04/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

02/04/2019 - Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce

01/09/2019 - Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce

Answer

11/14/2018 - Answer

Mediators Report

01/28/2019 - Mediators Report

Service Returned

11/08/2018 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

01/28/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Complaint

11/01/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: POAH CUTLER MANOR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER TO DISBURSE SENT TO COURT REGISTRY QUEUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31321:2111; Event Type: Event; Comments: & STIPULATION Parties: Warren Greshuna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Mediation; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: AMY / PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce Event Type: Event; Comments: MONDAY, JANUARY 28, 2019 @2:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2840013AMT PAID:$143.25 COMMENT:RENT DEPOSIT ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1$139.00$139.00 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$4.25$4.25 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$160.00 TENDER T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2840007AMT PAID:$1,834.50 NAME:GRESHUNA WARREN1087275 SW 216 ST UNIT 402MIAMI,FL. 33170 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1 $1,800.00 $1,800.00 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$34.50$34.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Warren Greshuna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070034AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/06/2018 REGISTER#:207CASHIER:CAREYSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Warren Greshuna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460010AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:COSTA, BRIAN C 2121 PONCE DE LEON BLVD SUITE 1100 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.