This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/25/2019 at 02:19:27 (UTC).

PLACERES RODRIGUEZ, YELEINY VS BARRIL PEREZ, OSMANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PLACERES RODRIGUEZ, YELEINY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BARRIL PEREZ, OSMANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Placeres Rodriguez, Yeleiny

Respondent

Barril Perez, Osmany

Minors

Barril, Adam

Barril, Angelique

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

01/17/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31301:1146; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Uncontest/diss; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Order Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: SET ON 01/17/19 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Returned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Uncontest/diss; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PlaceresRodriguez Yeleiny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BarrilPerez Osmany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Marital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BarrilPerez Osmany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PlaceresRodriguez Yeleiny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BarrilPerez Osmany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700005AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/28/2018 REGISTER#:270CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Filed at South Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less