This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/21/2019 at 02:50:18 (UTC).

PINNACLE PLACE LTD VS. BIANCA CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PINNACLE PLACE LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BIANCA CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pinnacle Place Ltd

GP PHG Place LLC

Defendant

Christopher, Bianca

Not Classified By Court

Pinnacle Place Ltd With Gp Phg Place LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lowenhaupt

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

01/24/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Motion to Vacate Judgment

02/06/2019 - Motion to Vacate Judgment

Order to Vacate Judgment

02/11/2019 - Order to Vacate Judgment

Motion for Default

12/31/2018 - Motion for Default

Default Final Judgment

01/15/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Default

01/02/2019 - Default

Motion for Default Judgment

12/31/2018 - Motion for Default Judgment

Service Returned

12/20/2018 - Service Returned

Non-Military Affidavit

12/31/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Vacate Judgment; Book/Page: 31329:4177; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND ENTRY OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Parties: Christopher Bianca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Vacate Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SHERIFF WITH CHECK # 24776$115.00 Parties: Christopher Bianca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31301:1437; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Christopher Bianca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Christopher Bianca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070004AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530005AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less