Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/23/2019 at 13:29:16 (UTC).

PALM ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL PAIN LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 PALM ORTHOPEDICS INTERVENTIONAL PAIN LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palm Orthopedics & Interventional Pain LLC

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Assignee

Santos, Silvia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Doe, Darien M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/23/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Request for Production

08/21/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/21/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Reply

06/25/2019 - Reply

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

06/25/2019 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/19/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

06/07/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/07/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

06/07/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

06/07/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

06/04/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

06/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Service of Process

06/03/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

04/12/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

12/14/2018 - Statement of Claim

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Trial (case at Issue); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170007AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2288-REFUND (ADJ - CTY)1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500027AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/18/2018 REGISTER#:350

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALM ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL PAIN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Doe, Darien M