This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/20/2020 at 12:37:44 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC VS KENIA GALIANO

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KENIA GALIANO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc

Defendant

Galiano, Kenia

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

09/24/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Voluntary Dismissal

08/23/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

06/14/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

05/31/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Order:

03/29/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/26/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

01/18/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

01/08/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

12/20/2018 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31585:3179; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Galiano Kenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2820007AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/31/2019 REGISTER#:282CASHIER:JUDYJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Galiano Kenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Galiano Kenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440018AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/08/2019 REGISTER#:344CASHIER:ROJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500088AMT PAID:$175.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/22/2018 REGISTER#:350CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant