This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 21:24:10 (UTC).

NORTH MIAMI THERAPY CTR, INC.(MARIE CARLINE THEUS) VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 NORTH MIAMI THERAPY CTR, INC MARIE CARLINE THEUS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North Miami Therapy Ctr, Inc.(Marie Carline Theus)

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin G Morgan

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

02/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Extension of Time

02/20/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/08/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Memorandum of Disposition

02/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/01/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/01/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/01/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/30/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion to Tax Cost

01/28/2019 - Motion to Tax Cost

Demand for Jury Trial

01/28/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

SP Pretrial Date

01/04/2019 - SP Pretrial Date

Statement of Claim

12/27/2018 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31351:563; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER ON STIPULATION WAVING APPEARANCE AT PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER STIPULATION WAVING APPEARANCE AT PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER ON STIP WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Tax Cost; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800021AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JUSTIN G MORGAN 2500 WESTON RD STE 211 WESTON FL 33331-3617 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3410006AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:JUSTIN G MORGAN 2500 WESTON RD STE 211 WESTON FL 33331-3617 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less