This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/25/2019 at 05:52:44 (UTC).

MULTIMED CARE, INC. VS EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MULTIMED CARE, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MULTIMED CARE, INC.

Defendant

EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

GONZALEZ, HECTOR ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armando A Brana

Defendant Attorney

Lawrence D Popritkin

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/15/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Filing:

02/11/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/04/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Compel

03/07/2019 - Motion to Compel

Request for Admissions

01/04/2019 - Request for Admissions

Order:

03/07/2019 - Order:

Notice:

02/11/2019 - Notice:

Voluntary Dismissal

03/15/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion to Compel

02/11/2019 - Motion to Compel

Pretrial Catalog

01/04/2019 - Pretrial Catalog

Motion in Limine

01/04/2019 - Motion in Limine

Notice of Filing:

01/04/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Notice of Filing:

01/04/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/04/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Filing:

01/04/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

12/27/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

01/04/2019 - Request for Production

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31368:3057; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PLNTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF NESTOR FERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF YEINS GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pretrial Catalog; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100017AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/05/2018 REGISTER#:310CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560044AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:ARMANDO A BRANA 7315 SW 87TH AVE STE. # 300 MIAMI FL 33173-5473 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less