This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/13/2018 at 03:07:48 (UTC).

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP VS GONZALEZ, MARIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2013 MTGLQ INVESTORS LP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GONZALEZ, MARIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATL MORT ASSN

Defendants

GONZALEZ, MARIA

GONZALEZ, JOSE

ABCO PREMIUM FINANCE LLC

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

ARROW FIANNCIAL SVCS LLC

ATIAL LLC

BAN OF THE WEST

CACH LLC

CALVARY PORTFOLIO SVCS LLC

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

CITIBANK NA

CITY OF NO MIAMI FL

CONSOLIDATED ASSET MGMT I LLC

DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY IRS

DISOVER BANK

ELITE RECOVERY SVCS INC

FIBERGLASS COATING INC FL CORP

FORD MOTOR CR CO LLC

FOUNTAINS EXECUTIVE CTENTRE INC

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEREMY ADAM LEE (ESQ)

Defendant Attorneys

Rodriguez, Jeannine Nicole

Delgado, Orlando

Regine Monestine

Other Attorneys

Dunn, Mark S

W. Kirby Bissell

Douglas C Zahm

May Hustey

Bales, Douglas M

Lanning, Peter E

Ramirez, Nicole R

 

Court Documents

Order on Motion to Strike

02/21/2018 - Order on Motion to Strike

Motion:

02/15/2018 - Motion:

Motion to Strike

02/08/2018 - Motion to Strike

Order:

01/18/2018 - Order:

Certificate of Service

12/27/2017 - Certificate of Service

Service Returned

11/18/2015 - Service Returned

Order:

07/29/2015 - Order:

Motion for Substitution of Counsel

04/22/2015 - Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Letter of Correspondence

08/22/2014 - Letter of Correspondence

Letter of Correspondence

07/24/2014 - Letter of Correspondence

Response to Request for Production

03/24/2014 - Response to Request for Production

Service Returned

05/09/2013 - Service Returned

Notice:

05/09/2013 - Notice:

Summons Returned - No Service

05/09/2013 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

05/09/2013 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/08/2013 - Service Returned

Answer

04/19/2013 - Answer

Entered Or Duplicated In Error

04/03/2013 - Entered Or Duplicated In Error

255 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECEMBER 5, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING TOGETHER WITH BUSINESS RECORDS ETC.....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • N/J Trials; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: 1 HOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPIES OF CERTIFIED COPIES OF ASSIGNMENT OF MRTG'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
284 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Hearing Info: N/J Trials; Hearing Code: NJTRIAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Hearing Info: N/J Trials; Hearing Code: NJTRIAL; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Hearing Info: N/J Trials; Hearing Code: NJTRIAL; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Hearing Info: N/J Trials; Hearing Code: NJTRIAL; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less