This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 20:15:40 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING (LLC) VS SANDRA NOVASHERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDRA NOVASHERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding (LLC)

Defendant

Novashernandez, Sandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Ashley Lenee

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Voluntary Dismissal

01/23/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

12/20/2018 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

12/10/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

01/30/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31308:2436; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Novashernandez Sandra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070001AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/12/2018 REGISTER#:207CASHIER:AT17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Novashernandez Sandra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540043AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE 887 DONALD ROSS ROAD JUNO BEACH FL 33408 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1269.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less