This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/25/2019 at 22:52:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING (LLC) VS CHRISTA CADET

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTA CADET. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding (LLC)

Defendant

Cadet, Christa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Ashley Lenee

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default Judgment

08/21/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Telephonic Hearing

01/17/2019 - Motion for Telephonic Hearing

Order Granting Telephonic Hearing

01/24/2019 - Order Granting Telephonic Hearing

Order Setting Management Conference

01/09/2019 - Order Setting Management Conference

Pre Trial Summons

12/06/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Affidavit as to Costs

08/21/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Mediators Report

04/09/2019 - Mediators Report

Memorandum of Disposition

04/09/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

01/09/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediators Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Mediation; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Telephonic Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: APRIL 8TH, 2019 @2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Telephonic Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Setting Management Conference; Event Type: Event; Comments: 04-08-2019 AT 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2750029AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/06/2018 REGISTER#:275CASHIER:ROSE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cadet Christa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540032AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE 887 DONALD ROSS ROAD JUNO BEACH FL 33408 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2511.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Hearing Info: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less