This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/24/2019 at 17:23:06 (UTC).

MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC VS FELIX RODRIGEUZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELIX RODRIGEUZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA LLC

Defendants

Gonzalez, Yeny

Rodrigeuz, Felix

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah C Daley

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Voluntary Dismissal

03/26/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Voluntary Dismissal

03/26/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

12/31/2018 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Service Returned

12/31/2018 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31384:1603; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450221AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:SARAH C DALEY 5801 ULMERTON RD STE 201 CLEARWATER FL 33760-3951 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Yeny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rodrigeuz Felix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510169AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SARAH C DALEY 5801 ULMERTON RD STE 201 CLEARWATER FL 33760-3951 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less