This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/24/2019 at 16:46:56 (UTC).

MED ADVANCED, CORP VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 MED ADVANCED, CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MED ADVANCED, CORP

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

PROHENZA, XIOMARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Plunkett, Kimberly A

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

01/29/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request for Admissions

01/30/2019 - Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

01/17/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/09/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

12/03/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/07/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Production

01/09/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/30/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Voluntary Dismissal

04/02/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

12/20/2018 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/01/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Filing:

12/11/2018 - Notice of Filing:

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

12/21/2018 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion:

01/25/2019 - Motion:

Statement of Claim

11/19/2018 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

01/09/2019 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

01/09/2019 - Request for Admissions

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/29/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31388:4689; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOT TO EXHAUST BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3280028AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$130.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/04/2018 REGISTER#:328CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490023AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.