This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/06/2019 at 13:13:58 (UTC).

MARK TISCHER ET AL VS. GARY LICHTENSTEIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MARK TISCHER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARY LICHTENSTEIN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tischer, Mark

Rental Property Management Services

Heysen, Maria Del Socorro

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Lichtenstein, Gary

Lichtenstein, Shoshana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fabrikant, Kevin H.

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

12/18/2018 - Service Returned

Final Judgment by Judge

12/31/2018 - Final Judgment by Judge

Service Returned

12/18/2018 - Service Returned

Motion to Stay

01/09/2019 - Motion to Stay

Copy of:

01/07/2019 - Copy of:

Order of Default

12/31/2018 - Order of Default

Copy of:

01/09/2019 - Copy of:

Motion to Stay

01/07/2019 - Motion to Stay

Emergency Motion

01/04/2019 - Emergency Motion

Copy of:

01/07/2019 - Copy of:

Copy of:

01/02/2019 - Copy of:

Motion to Strike

12/28/2018 - Motion to Strike

Final Judgment by Judge

12/31/2018 - Final Judgment by Judge

Writ of Possession Issued

02/07/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Answer

12/24/2018 - Answer

Motion:

01/02/2019 - Motion:

Affidavit of:

12/28/2018 - Affidavit of:

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SHERIFF WITH CHECK # 3185$115.00 Parties: Lichtenstein Gary; Lichtenstein Shoshana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY MTN TO STAY REVIEWED BY THE COURT-DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Stay; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SECOND EMERGENCY MTN REVIEWED BY THE COURT-DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY OF EMERGENCY STAY REVIEWED BY THE COURT-DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Stay; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: SECOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY MTN REVIEWED BY THE COURT-DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Fabrikant Kevin H.; Tischer Mark; Heysen Maria Del Socorro; Rental Property Management Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUEST FOR TIME Parties: Lichtenstein Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170038AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$120.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/10/2018 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lichtenstein Gary; Lichtenstein Shoshana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Tischer Mark; Heysen Maria Del Socorro; Rental Property Management Services; Lichtenstein Gary; Lichtenstein Shoshana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530087AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:FABRIKANT, KEVIN H. 7777 DAVIE ROAD EXT STE 100A HOLLYWOOD FL 33024-2514 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less