This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/04/2019 at 00:56:40 (UTC).

MARGATE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, INC. VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MARGATE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margate Chiropractic Clinic, Inc.

Defendants

Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation

Allstate Indemnity Company

Assignee

Cidoine, Frances

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Dominguez, Claudia

Asencion, Ivan

Dominguez, Claudia, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

11/05/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Motion for Extension of Time

07/01/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

07/29/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

06/28/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

06/28/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

06/28/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Service of Process

06/17/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2340021AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/13/2019 REGISTER#:234

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210006AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2019 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:CAL5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500006AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/30/2018 REGISTER#:350

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less