This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/23/2019 at 12:14:45 (UTC).

MARCUS CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 MARCUS CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcus Chiropractic Center, Inc.

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Corsino, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

09/20/2019 - Motion to Compel

Request for Production

06/21/2019 - Request for Production

Notice:

06/12/2019 - Notice:

Memorandum of Disposition

06/03/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order of Recusal

05/31/2019 - Order of Recusal

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

05/31/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

05/30/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion for Attorneys Fees

05/29/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Pre Trial Summons

04/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

01/28/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

12/13/2018 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT AS TO BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2220030AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/11/2019 REGISTER#:222

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2220001AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/11/2019 REGISTER#:222

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450015AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/15/2018 REGISTER#:345

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.