This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/26/2019 at 12:20:20 (UTC).

LINDA SERRANO VS VALLS GROUP HOLDINGS, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 LINDA SERRANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLS GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serrano, Linda

Defendants

LA CARRETA

Valls Group Holdings, Inc

FGHP 117, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Agrait, Miriam Fresco

Defendant Attorneys

Jose A Socorro

Mcgrane, Miles Ambrose, IV

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

03/26/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

02/07/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/14/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Unavailability/absence

05/21/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Service Returned

09/24/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/08/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

AgreedOrder

07/30/2019 - AgreedOrder

Amended Complaint

07/08/2019 - Amended Complaint

Mot to File Amended Complaint

07/08/2019 - Mot to File Amended Complaint

Order on Motion to Compel

04/23/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/08/2019 - Motion to Compel

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Response to Request for Production

07/08/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

01/15/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Taking Deposition

11/15/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Request for Production

11/14/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/21/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/02/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mcgrane Miles Ambrose IV; FGHP 117 LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Valls Group Holdings Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510266AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:AGRAIT, MIRIAM FRESCO RUBENSTEIN LAW, P.A. 9130 S. DADELAND BLVD, PH MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430349AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:AGRAIT, MIRIAM FRESCO RUBENSTEIN LAW, P.A. 9130 S. DADELAND BLVD, PH MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less