This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/18/2019 at 15:15:11 (UTC).

LIN YANG ET AL VS. ALEXANDER GARCIA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 LIN YANG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALEXANDER GARCIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chiang, Winghung

Yang, Lin

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Garcia, Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fabrikant, Kevin H.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

01/18/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Service Returned

12/13/2018 - Service Returned

Default Final Judgment

01/07/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Motion for Default

12/19/2018 - Motion for Default

Affidavit as to Costs

12/19/2018 - Affidavit as to Costs

Default

12/26/2018 - Default

Default Final Judgment

01/07/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT CK Parties: Garcia Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31289:3763; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Garcia Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Garcia Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFF OF NON PAYMENT AND NON MILTARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2320023AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/07/2018 REGISTER#:232CASHIER:TWYLAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Garcia Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560043AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:FABRIKANT, KEVIN H. 7777 DAVIE ROAD EXT STE 100A HOLLYWOOD FL 33024-2514 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less