This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/24/2019 at 04:51:59 (UTC).

LEGACY RENTALS LLC VS ISADORA LOIS ROWE ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 LEGACY RENTALS LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against ISADORA LOIS ROWE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGACY RENTALS LLC

Defendants

MARCUS SAIZ DE LA MORA, TAX COLLECTOR

TBOM MORTGAGE HOLDING LLC

ROWE, ISADORA LOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jones, Steven Larson

Defendant Attorney

Lauren E Morse

 

Court Documents

Summary Final Judgment

07/09/2019 - Summary Final Judgment

Summary Final Judgment

07/09/2019 - Summary Final Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/11/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Hearing-

06/11/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Report of Ad Litem

04/25/2019 - Report of Ad Litem

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

04/11/2019 - Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

04/11/2019 - Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Motion to Appoint Guardian/Administrator/Attorney Ad Litem

03/05/2019 - Motion to Appoint Guardian/Administrator/Attorney Ad Litem

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

03/05/2019 - Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Proof of Publication

02/19/2019 - Proof of Publication

Service Returned

01/30/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/30/2019 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Constructive Service

01/18/2019 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Notice of Action - Publication

01/18/2019 - Notice of Action - Publication

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Summary Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31533:4929; Event Type: Event; Comments: QUIETING TITLE Parties: ROWE ISADORA LOIS; TBOM MORTGAGE HOLDING LLC; MARCUS SAIZ DE LA MORA TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Aff In Support of Mtn for Final/summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Law; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 7-9-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Report of Ad Litem; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem; Event Type: Event; Comments: (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ROWE ISADORA LOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lauren E Morse; MARCUS SAIZ DE LA MORA TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2120055AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/06/2018 REGISTER#:212CASHIER:CAREYSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: TBOM MORTGAGE HOLDING LLC; MARCUS SAIZ DE LA MORA TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430339AMT PAID:$406.00 NAME:JONES, STEVEN LARSON 9999 NE 2ND AVE MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2352 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31237:1793; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Hearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less