This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/13/2018 at 19:52:32 (UTC).

JOSEPH, ARSENE VS TALABERT, ELIKER

Case Summary

On 04/23/2013 JOSEPH, ARSENE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TALABERT, ELIKER. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH, ARSENE

ESTATE OF ELUSMA JOSEPH DECEASED

Joseph, Arsene (personal rep)

Estate Of Elusma Joseph (deceased)

Defendants

TALABERT, ELIKER

SOUTHERN LAND FARM, INC.

ST. LOUIS, SANIER

MEJIA, DANIEL

MUNILLA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEMS INC

MIAMI-DADE EXPRESSWAY AUTHORITY

EAC CONSULTING INC

A2 GROUP INC

REYNOLDS, SMITH AND HILLS INC

Mejia Farming & Harvesting

Munilla Construction Management (llc)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

TODD R MCPHARLIN

Kenneth S Pollock

Black, Chandler

G Kenneth Norrie

Pierce, Francis Edmund, III

Desai, Devang

Corkran, Christopher T

Kenneth J Carusello

Albert, Damian H

De Carlo, Tracey

Steven R Adamsky

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

11/09/2015 - Response to Request for Production

Notice:

08/13/2015 - Notice:

Email Notice:

06/04/2015 - Email Notice:

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

05/05/2015 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Answer

04/27/2015 - Answer

Request for Production

08/25/2014 - Request for Production

Notice:

06/06/2014 - Notice:

Order:

05/20/2014 - Order:

Response to Request for Production

05/07/2014 - Response to Request for Production

Request for Production

03/26/2014 - Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/25/2014 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatory

03/06/2014 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Production

02/11/2014 - Response to Request for Production

Motion to Dismiss

10/25/2013 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice:

06/11/2013 - Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/04/2013 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer

05/21/2013 - Answer

Service Returned

05/13/2013 - Service Returned

333 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: THIS HIS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: THIS HIS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: THIS HIS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: THIS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 29986:596; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: De Carlo Tracey; Kenneth S Pollock; G Kenneth Norrie; Albert Damian H; Corkran Christopher T; Pierce Francis Edmund III; Steven R Adamsky; Kenneth J Carusello; Desai Devang; Talabert Eliker; Southern Land Farm Inc.; St. Louis Sanier; Mejia Daniel; Mejia Daniel; Munilla Construction Management (llc); Florida Department Of Transportation; Energy Absorption Systems Inc; Miami-Dade Expressway Authority; Eac Consulting Inc; A2 Group Inc; Reynolds Smith And Hills Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: OBJ TO PLAINT. SUPP INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: OBJ TO PLAINTIFF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFT'S ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEM, INC.. AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: THE REQUEST FOR QUALIFICATIONS IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
357 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Hearing Info: Transfer Calendar; Hearing Code: TRAN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less