This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/21/2019 at 13:18:52 (UTC).

JOSE ABREU ET AL VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 JOSE ABREU filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABREU, JOSE

ABREU, HORTENSIA

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilson, Cameron Wayne

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

11/28/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

11/28/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/28/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Taking Deposition

11/28/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

Request for Production

11/28/2018 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160093AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WILSON, CAMERON WAYNE 1990 SW 27TH AVE FL 3 MIAMI FL 33145-2547 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510122AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WILSON, CAMERON WAYNE 1990 SW 27TH AVE FL 3 MIAMI FL 33145-2547 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less