This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/22/2019 at 00:00:29 (UTC).

JIMENEZ, ROLANDO CRISTINO VS MARTINEZ, ALEXANDRA CID

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 JIMENEZ, ROLANDO CRISTINO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARTINEZ, ALEXANDRA CID. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jimenez, Rolando Cristino

Respondent

Martinez, Alexandra Cid

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

01/14/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31296:2053; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Uncontest/diss; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 01/14/2019 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Aff/Cert of Corroborating Witness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martinez Alexandra Cid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jimenez Rolando Cristino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martinez Alexandra Cid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080012AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/28/2018 REGISTER#:208CASHIER:FARAHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less