This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/25/2019 at 00:43:41 (UTC).

J. MILTON DADELAND, LLC VS. BETSY Z ARAUJO

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 J MILTON DADELAND, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BETSY Z ARAUJO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. Milton Dadeland, LLC

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Araujo, Betsy Z

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default

01/15/2019 - Motion for Default

Default

01/16/2019 - Default

Service Returned

01/15/2019 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Non-Payment

01/15/2019 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Final Judgment by Judge

01/29/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Complaint

12/27/2018 - Complaint

Non-Military Affidavit

12/27/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit as to Costs

01/15/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Affidavit of:

12/27/2018 - Affidavit of:

Writ of Possession Issued

02/01/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT WITH CK Parties: Araujo Betsy Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31316:1018; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Araujo Betsy Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: FINAL JUDGMNT SENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Araujo Betsy Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non-Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Araujo Betsy Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540037AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/03/2019 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: J. Milton Dadeland LLC; Araujo Betsy Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130010AMT PAID:$185.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/01/2019 REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.