This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/18/2019 at 21:57:42 (UTC).

IN RE:OSTROVSKY, ETYA

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 IN RE OSTROVSKY, ETYA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reeves, Fennie

Decedent

Ostrovsky, Etya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Siegel, Barry Douglas

 

Court Documents

Order Admitting Will to Probate

03/12/2019 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

Order of Summary Administration

03/12/2019 - Order of Summary Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1 CC ORDER OF SUMMARY TO THE SIEGEL LAW GROUP.,2499 GLADES ROAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Certified Copy Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Will; Event Type: Event; Comments: 9 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Admitting Will to Probate; Book/Page: 31362:1196; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31362:1188; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM ATTORNEY BARRY D. SIEGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: OFETYA OSTROVSKY(ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Pending Will; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: AVENTURA HOSPITAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3320010AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:SIEGEL, BARRY DOUGLAS 1200 N FEDERAL HWY STE 200 BOCA RATON FL 33432-2813 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Motion to Determine Confidentiality of Court Records; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Paid Funeral Bill; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Last Will and Testament - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Petition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less