This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/03/2019 at 10:57:53 (UTC).

IN RE:BELLIARD, MERCEDES

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 IN RE BELLIARD, MERCEDES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rosario, Yania

Decedent

Belliard, Mercedes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Grimaldi, Melinda

 

Court Documents

Order of Summary Administration

04/23/2019 - Order of Summary Administration

Order Determining Homestead

04/23/2019 - Order Determining Homestead

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1 CC ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD AND 1 CC ORDER OF SUMMARY TO MELINDA GRIMALDI,ESQ.GRIMALDI LAW FIRM.,2719 HOLLYWOOD BLVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Certified Copy Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31415:427; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Determining Homestead; Book/Page: 31415:281; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Satisfaction and Release of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: BY FPL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Formal Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Proof of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Petition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less