This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/27/2020 at 13:00:10 (UTC).

IN RE: CORDA, CHARLES RICHARD

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 IN RE CORDA, CHARLES RICHARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

Corda, Marissa

Corda-McGreevy, Samantha

Decedent

Corda, Charles Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

Straley, Stephen James

 

Court Documents

Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

07/09/2019 - Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

06/25/2019 - Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

Letters of Administration

03/11/2019 - Letters of Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

11/28/2018 - Oath of Personal Representative

Oath of Personal Representative

11/28/2018 - Oath of Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: FPL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketObjection to Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketObjection to Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketObjection to Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCopy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CLAIM MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: OVERRULING OBJTN T/VACATING ORD AUTHORZ SALE & REQUING PR T/FILE INVTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Sale of Real Property; Book/Page: 31523:865; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketSpecial Appointment; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: HEARING TO APPROVE SALE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketClaim Filed Against Estate; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM FPL $398.39

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPetition for Det of Heirs/benef/homest; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPetition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31239:1088; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31239:2524; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPetition for Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less