This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/07/2019 at 13:10:31 (UTC).

IN RE: BARANEK, MARY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 IN RE BARANEK, MARY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Velazquez, Maria

Decedent

BARANEK, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Aponte, Rosy Anette

 

Court Documents

Petition for Administration

11/19/2018 - Petition for Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

11/19/2018 - Oath of Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL Parties: BARANEK MARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Inventory Filed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Affidavit in Support; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF PETT TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM: CASE MANAGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNIOR EUGENE BARANEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPLCTN DETERMN O/CIVL INDGT STTU SIGNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3320005AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:APONTE, ROSY ANETTE 8180 NW 36TH ST STE 301 MIAMI FL 33166-6660 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$401.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Inventory Filed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Administration; Book/Page: 31231:3670; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31231:3668; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less