This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/25/2019 at 07:37:15 (UTC).

HEALTHY BODY MEDICAL CENTER VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 HEALTHY BODY MEDICAL CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Healthy Body Medical Center

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Assignee

Granados, Nuris L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maria E Corredor (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Campos, Raquel

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/29/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order:

01/17/2019 - Order:

Motion for Extension of Time

12/18/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

12/17/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

11/29/2018 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/21/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/20/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/20/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

11/19/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/19/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

11/19/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Taking Deposition

11/19/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Complaint

11/19/2018 - Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31464:2447; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3350011AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MARIA E CORREDOR (ESQ) CORREDOR, HUSSEINI & SNEDAKER, P.A. 3905 NW 107 AV DORAL FL 33178 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490039AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MARIA E CORREDOR (ESQ) CORREDOR, HUSSEINI & SNEDAKER, P.A. 3905 NW 107 AV DORAL FL 33178 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490017AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MARIA E CORREDOR (ESQ) CORREDOR, HUSSEINI & SNEDAKER, P.A. 3905 NW 107 AV DORAL FL 33178 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING AC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.