This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/12/2019 at 23:25:58 (UTC).

HEALTH IN MOTION, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 HEALTH IN MOTION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTH IN MOTION, INC.

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

LEON WING, CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

Armando A Brana

Defendant Attorneys

Braile, Deborah L

Hayden, Kelsey, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Continuance

09/11/2019 - Motion for Continuance

Notice of Filing:

04/08/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/19/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

03/19/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

03/15/2019 - Privilege Log

Motion for Extension of Time

03/15/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice:

03/08/2019 - Notice:

Motion to Strike

03/06/2019 - Motion to Strike

Answer

02/28/2019 - Answer

Notice of Filing:

02/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Admissions

02/19/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

02/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

02/19/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/11/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Appearance

02/06/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

12/28/2018 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Request for Admissions

12/28/2018 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

12/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: WOODLYN/CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Continuance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130054AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:ARMANDO A BRANA 7315 SW 87TH AVE STE. # 300 MIAMI FL 33173-5473 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.