This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/25/2019 at 02:06:07 (UTC).

GONZALEZ`S MEDICAL CENTER INC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 GONZALEZ S MEDICAL CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ`S MEDICAL CENTER INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Gonzalez Mago, Laura A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Plunkett, Kimberly A

 

Court Documents

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

01/07/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Pre Trial Summons

12/11/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Motion for Extension of Time

01/24/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion for Summary Judgment

02/11/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Order of Recusal

01/08/2019 - Order of Recusal

Voluntary Dismissal

06/04/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Memorandum of Disposition

01/14/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Extension of Time

01/23/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31476:3927; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980045AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$210.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/11/2018 REGISTER#:298CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560014AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less