This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/24/2019 at 23:22:57 (UTC).

GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER CORP. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER CORP.

Assignor

ARIAS, MICHELLE

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Doe, Darien M

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

05/14/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

04/17/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Relief from Judgment

04/17/2019 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Motion to Compel

04/16/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/13/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

03/13/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Reply to Answer

03/13/2019 - Reply to Answer

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/01/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Summary Judgment

02/27/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Response to Request for Production

02/04/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Request for Production

01/29/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

01/29/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

01/28/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/28/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

01/28/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

12/14/2018 - Notice:

SP Pretrial Date

12/07/2018 - SP Pretrial Date

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080004AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3360016AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less