This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 20:26:13 (UTC).

GENERAL REHABILITATION FACILITY CO VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 GENERAL REHABILITATION FACILITY CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENERAL REHABILITATION FACILITY CO

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Ivy, Tiffany

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Harris, Andrea L

 

Court Documents

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/11/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Memorandum of Disposition

01/14/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Voluntary Dismissal

03/05/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/14/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Motion for Extension of Time

01/29/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Pre Trial Summons

12/11/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31353:4624; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980046AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$210.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/11/2018 REGISTER#:298CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560013AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less