This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/08/2019 at 12:23:42 (UTC).

GARSH INVESTMENTS LLLP, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILI VS JORGE E. LEON ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 GARSH INVESTMENTS LLLP, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JORGE E LEON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garsh Investments LLLP, a Delaware limited liabili

Defendants

Dade County Federal Credit Union

The Sovereigns Condominium Association, Inc. a FL

State of Florida

Jorge E. Leon, Jane Doe Leon Spouse of

Ford Motor Credit Company

Miami Dade County, Florida

Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Servic

Leon, Jorge E.

Mastec Network Solutions

Asset Acceptance, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chisholm, Robert M

Defendant Attorneys

Robert David Dunn

Dunn, Mark S

Friedman, Eyal I.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

09/05/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Response to Motion

09/03/2019 - Response to Motion

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

08/07/2019 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Motion for Final Judgment

08/05/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Answer

01/24/2019 - Answer

Motion for Extension of Time

12/21/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer

12/11/2018 - Answer

Service Returned

12/05/2018 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Leon Jorge E.; Jorge E. Leon Jane Doe Leon Spouse of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Note and Mortgage; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 9/5/19 @ 8:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31238:3169; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Hearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less