This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/12/2019 at 13:14:44 (UTC).

FORECLOSURE ADVISORS LLC VS GIOVANNI RODRIGUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 FORECLOSURE ADVISORS LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GIOVANNI RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORECLOSURE ADVISORS LLC

Defendants

CAMPBELL, ANA P

RODRIGUEZ BELTRAN , GIOVANNI

FLEETONE LLC

CLERK OF COURT MIAMI DADE COUNTY FLORIDA

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

FINANCIAL PACIFIC LEASING LLC

BANKERS SURETY SERVICES INC

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

RODRIGUEZ, GIOVANNI

CITY OF HOMESTEAD FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vandergriff, Lea W.

Defendant Attorneys

Eric T Salpeter (esq)

Pizzi , Michael A, Jr

 

Court Documents

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

05/24/2019 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Motion:

05/08/2019 - Motion:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/08/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

05/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Final Disposition Document

03/21/2019 - Final Disposition Document

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

02/12/2019 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy; Book/Page: 31457:2573; Event Type: Event; Comments: 19-16907-RAM Parties: RODRIGUEZ GIOVANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RODRIGUEZ GIOVANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee; Event Type: Event; Comments: SALE DATE: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO POSTPONE SALE DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A WRITTEN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO POSTPONE SALE DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO POSPONE SALE DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510093AMT PAID:$425.00 NAME:VANDERGRIFF, LEA W. 8201 PETERS RD STE 3000 PLANTATION FL 33324-3292 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$15.00$15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Book/Page: 31238:3054; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less