This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/22/2019 at 01:35:19 (UTC).

FAITH MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 FAITH MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faith Medical Group, Inc.

Assignor

Reyes, Claudia

Defendant

Star Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pomares, Fernando J

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

12/03/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

01/14/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Notice:

01/30/2019 - Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Star Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2520008AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2018 REGISTER#:252CASHIER:P27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560042AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:POMARES, FERNANDO J 12002 SW 128TH CT STE 104 MIAMI FL 33186-4641 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less