This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/25/2019 at 21:31:23 (UTC).

EMS RESTORATION A/A/O JAVIER MESA VS SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 EMS RESTORATION A/A/O JAVIER MESA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMS RESTORATION a/a/o JAVIER MESA

Defendant

SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKOS, OMAR

Defendant Attorney

Parris, Melanie Ann

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/29/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Extension of Time

12/27/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Voluntary Dismissal

04/24/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Request for Production

11/28/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

12/07/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

11/28/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31416:1650; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560052AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BAKOS, OMAR 848 BRICKELL AVE STE 810 MIAMI FL 33131-2976 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560019AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:BAKOS, OMAR 848 BRICKELL AVE STE 810 MIAMI FL 33131-2976 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less