This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/22/2020 at 16:07:53 (UTC).

EMPIRE RESTORATION & CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/30/2018 EMPIRE RESTORATION CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Empire Restoration & Construction, Inc.

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carbonell, Jorge L, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Valerie M Jackson

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

12/30/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

09/11/2019 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/25/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice:

03/11/2019 - Notice:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

08/26/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice:

03/11/2019 - Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/18/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice:

03/05/2019 - Notice:

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/15/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/24/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

09/30/2019 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion to Compel

08/09/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

02/17/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Production

12/30/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Change of Address

03/19/2019 - Notice of Change of Address

Request for Admissions

12/30/2018 - Request for Admissions

Motion to Compel

07/19/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Filing:

09/27/2019 - Notice of Filing:

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MSJFILED ON 111519SET BY BELINDA DEFT OKWOPC 305-670-1101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING DEF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/03/2019 REGISTER#:303CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130118AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:CARBONELL, JORGE L, ESQ 75 VALENCIA AVE FL 8 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6141 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: 15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.