This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/20/2019 at 11:44:30 (UTC).

ECHEVERRIA DESIGN GROUP, INC., VS LLOYD SUGARMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 ECHEVERRIA DESIGN GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LLOYD SUGARMAN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ECHEVERRIA DESIGN GROUP, INC.,

Defendants

SUGARMAN, LLOYD

SUGARMAN, RHONDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sosa, Katrina M, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Rodriguez, Ralf R

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

01/30/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Service Returned

12/19/2018 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/19/2018 - Service Returned

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

03/20/2019 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

Notice of Appearance

01/03/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

03/20/2019 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rodriguez Ralf R; SUGARMAN LLOYD; SUGARMAN RHONDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SUGARMAN LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SUGARMAN RHONDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510278AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:SOSA, KATRINA M, ESQ 201 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1205 MIAMI FL 33131-4317 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510117AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SOSA, KATRINA M, ESQ 201 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1205 MIAMI FL 33131-4317 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less