This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/08/2019 at 12:13:23 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SERGIO BLANCO

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERGIO BLANCO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BLANCO, SERGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran David

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

04/25/2019 - Certificate of Service

Default Final Judgment

04/12/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

04/12/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment

04/12/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment

Final Disposition Document

04/12/2019 - Final Disposition Document

Affidavit as to Costs

04/12/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Default

03/08/2019 - Default

Notice of Filing:

03/04/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Non-Military Affidavit

03/04/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

03/04/2019 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

01/17/2019 - Service Returned

Complaint

12/21/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31409:3726; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BLANCO SERGIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BLANCO SERGIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210032AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/27/2018 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BLANCO SERGIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490044AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.