This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/08/2019 at 18:28:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS RENE L PINTADO

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENE L PINTADO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

PINTADO, RENE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran David

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned - No Service

12/21/2018 - Summons Returned - No Service

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Service Returned

12/21/2018 - Service Returned

Order of Dismissal

02/04/2019 - Order of Dismissal

SP Pretrial Date

12/04/2018 - SP Pretrial Date

Notice:

02/07/2019 - Notice:

Order of Dismissal

02/04/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Stipulation

02/05/2019 - Stipulation

Memorandum of Disposition

01/28/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31349:3301; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIPULATION Parties: PINTADO RENE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080003AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PINTADO RENE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490008AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $4,467.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less