This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 20:17:31 (UTC).

DIANELA GOMEZ VS. TRANIECE MICHELLE SMITH

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 DIANELA GOMEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRANIECE MICHELLE SMITH. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gomez, Dianela

Defendant

Smith, Traniece Michelle

Not Classified By Court

L/T

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

01/03/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Motion:

01/07/2019 - Motion:

Order:

01/07/2019 - Order:

Writ of Possession Issued

01/04/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

01/03/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Answer

12/03/2018 - Answer

Amended Answer

12/10/2018 - Amended Answer

Service Returned

11/30/2018 - Service Returned

Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

01/11/2019 - Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

Indigent Payment

12/10/2018 - Indigent Payment

Order:

01/11/2019 - Order:

Affidavit as to Costs

12/24/2018 - Affidavit as to Costs

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Order on Motion to Strike

01/02/2019 - Order on Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Disposition

01/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

01/07/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Strike

12/21/2018 - Motion to Strike

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: DIANELA GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: LIFTING STAY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Evictions; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: SET BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUESTING MONEY FROM COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT WITH CK Parties: Smith Traniece Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Indigent Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADDING MORE ANSWER AS TO PROOF TO MAKEING PAYMENTS TO THE RENT Parties: Smith Traniece Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Smith Traniece Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Smith Traniece Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2530019AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$200.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Smith Traniece Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Smith Traniece Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Evictions; Hearing Code: EVICT; Hearing Time: 1:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less