This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/22/2019 at 23:51:07 (UTC).

DEPENDABLE TITLE SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC VS ISRAEL ALVAREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 DEPENDABLE TITLE SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISRAEL ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPENDABLE TITLE SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC

Defendants

ALL FLORIDA PROPERTY GROUP INC.

ALVAREZ, ISRAEL

ALVAREZ, CARMEN

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DBA CHRISTIA

AVALAR REALTY GROUP, INC.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

07/19/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Certificate of Service

07/19/2019 - Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

07/19/2019 - Certificate of Service

Motion for Extension of Time

07/19/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

07/19/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

06/06/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

02/11/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/11/2019 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

02/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

SP Pretrial Date

12/31/2018 - SP Pretrial Date

SP Pretrial Date

12/31/2018 - SP Pretrial Date

SP Pretrial Date

12/31/2018 - SP Pretrial Date

Rejection Letter Sent

12/11/2018 - Rejection Letter Sent

Directions to The Clerk

11/28/2018 - Directions to The Clerk

Directions to The Clerk

11/28/2018 - Directions to The Clerk

Amended Directions

11/28/2018 - Amended Directions

Statement of Claim

11/21/2018 - Statement of Claim

Notice:

11/21/2018 - Notice:

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS Parties: DEPENDABLE TITLE SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070013AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2019 REGISTER#:207CASHIER:YADIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALVAREZ CARMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALVAREZ ISRAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALVAREZ ISRAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection Letter Sent; Event Type: Event; Comments: NEED PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Directions to The Clerk; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD, WE DO NOT ACCEPT BLANK ORDERS/SUMMONS THROUGH THE E-PORTAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Directions to The Clerk; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD, WE DO NOT ACCEPT BLANK ORDERS/SUMMONS THROUGH THE E-PORTAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Directions; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD, WE DO NOT ACCEPT BLANK ORDERS/SUMMONS THROUGH THE E-PORTAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440003AMT PAID:$175.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/27/2018 REGISTER#:344CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less