This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/25/2019 at 04:55:50 (UTC).

CSH 2016-2 BORROWER LLC VS. TANNY NUNEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 CSH 2016-2 BORROWER LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TANNY NUNEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

CSH 2016-2 Borrower LLC

Defendants

Valle, Glenda

Mendez, Juan

Nunez, Tanny

Nunez, Daniela

Nunez, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lowenhaupt

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

01/24/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Writ of Possession Issued

02/01/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

01/24/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Non-Military Affidavit

12/19/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion to Strike

12/19/2018 - Motion to Strike

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/12/2018 - Service Returned

Answer

12/11/2018 - Answer

Complaint

11/27/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHERIFF W/CK #25019 Parties: Nunez Tanny; Nunez Daniel; Mendez Juan; Nunez Daniela; Valle Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31335:817; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Nunez Tanny; Nunez Daniel; Mendez Juan; Nunez Daniela; Valle Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Nunez Tanny; Nunez Daniel; Mendez Juan; Nunez Daniela; Valle Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060004AMT PAID:$50.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE5$10.00$50.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Nunez Tanny; Nunez Daniel; Mendez Juan; Nunez Daniela; Valle Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3390021AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less