This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/05/2020 at 11:18:16 (UTC).

COR INJURY CENTERS OF MIAMI, INC. VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 COR INJURY CENTERS OF MIAMI, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cor Injury Centers of Miami, Inc.

Assignor

Cruz Martinez, Dulce

Defendant

Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levine, Mark Aaron

Defendant Attorney

Saavedra Antonio X

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

09/23/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

09/05/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/21/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/21/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Compliance

06/13/2019 - Notice of Compliance

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/11/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

06/11/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Interrogatory

05/07/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Filing:

05/07/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion to Compel

05/07/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Strike

05/03/2019 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Unavailability/absence

04/18/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion for Extension of Time

04/01/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request:

03/14/2019 - Request:

Request for Production

03/14/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/14/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Appearance

03/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing:

01/23/2019 - Notice of Filing:

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLTF'S SECOND RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND RQPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLTF'S RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND RQPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3320072AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LEVINE, MARK AARON 1150 NW 72 AVENUE, SUITE 600 MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$90.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500119AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:LEVINE, MARK AARON 1150 NW 72 AVENUE, SUITE 600 MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COR INJURY CENTERS OF MIAMI, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saavedra Antonio X