Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/22/2019 at 16:26:09 (UTC).

COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOLLYWOOD VS SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOLLYWOOD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cor Injury Centers of Hollywood

Defendant

Security National Insurance Company

Assignee

Volcy, Yves

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Parrales, Julio, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

07/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Attorneys Fees

02/14/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Motion for Final Judgment

02/14/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Notice:

02/11/2019 - Notice:

Memorandum of Disposition

01/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order:

01/04/2019 - Order:

Order:

01/04/2019 - Order:

Request:

01/02/2019 - Request:

Motion for Extension of Time

12/27/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

12/27/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/27/2018 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Request for Production

12/14/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

12/14/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

12/14/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request:

12/14/2018 - Request:

Notice of Appearance

12/13/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

11/27/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

11/12/2018 - Statement of Claim

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31547:213; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT S CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Event Type: Event; Comments: LETTER REQUESTING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080009AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR. 9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306 MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Security National Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510021AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR. 9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306 MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOLLYWOOD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIO J PARRALES