Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/07/2019 at 02:28:03 (UTC).

CLPF NBV LP VS. MARCEL MATIAS

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 CLPF NBV LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARCEL MATIAS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

CLPF NBV LP

Moda North Bay Village

Defendant

Matias, Marcel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R Mccain

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

01/08/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Default Final Judgment

12/21/2018 - Default Final Judgment

Default Final Judgment

12/21/2018 - Default Final Judgment

Certificate of Service

12/21/2018 - Certificate of Service

Default

12/05/2018 - Default

Non-Military Affidavit

12/04/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion:

12/04/2018 - Motion:

Motion for Default

12/04/2018 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

11/27/2018 - Service Returned

Complaint

11/19/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT ISSUED WT CK# 45452 Parties: Matias Marcel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31287:221; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Matias Marcel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Matias Marcel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180013AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/21/2018 REGISTER#:318CASHIER:MARIAAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Matias Marcel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530007AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:RYAN R MCCAIN BARFIELD. MCCAIN , P.A. 4241 NORTHLAKE BLVD, STE B PALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33410 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN