This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/18/2019 at 22:26:41 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC VS NANCY VALDES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NANCY VALDES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

Assignor

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC

Defendants

RUIZ, JOSE

VALDES, NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah C Daley

 

Court Documents

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Voluntary Dismissal

03/08/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Summons Returned - No Service

12/17/2018 - Summons Returned - No Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Summons Returned - No Service

12/10/2018 - Summons Returned - No Service

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31363:3068; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440094AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:SARAH C DALEY 5801 ULMERTON RD STE 201 CLEARWATER FL 33760-3951 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RUIZ JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VALDES NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530100AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:SARAH C DALEY 5801 ULMERTON RD STE 201 CLEARWATER FL 33760-3951 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less