This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/08/2019 at 18:54:46 (UTC).

CARE & SERVICES REHABILITATION, INC. VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 CARE SERVICES REHABILITATION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARE & SERVICES REHABILITATION, INC.

Assignor

TROUPE, COREY

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Michelle P. Babinksy, Esq

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/13/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

01/28/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/28/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/28/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/28/2019 - Request for Admissions

Memorandum of Disposition

01/28/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/22/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

01/18/2019 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Filing:

01/08/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice:

12/19/2018 - Notice:

SP Pretrial Date

12/07/2018 - SP Pretrial Date

Statement of Claim

11/26/2018 - Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31364:4398; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080001AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3390002AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less