This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/15/2020 at 12:20:06 (UTC).

CARE & SERVICES OF REHABILITATION, INC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 CARE SERVICES OF REHABILITATION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARE & SERVICES OF REHABILITATION, INC.

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

CHACON FRANCO, JULIO A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Trefzger, Karen E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/11/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

01/29/2020 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Notice of Taking Deposition

11/05/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion to Compel

10/05/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

10/05/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/31/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Hearing-

06/18/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/19/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/08/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

02/04/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

02/04/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/04/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/04/2019 - Request for Admissions

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/01/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Service of Process

01/17/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Demand for Jury Trial

01/04/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Statement of Claim

12/11/2018 - Statement of Claim

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210003AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3470019AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less