This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 21:13:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS TYRONE WILDER

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against TYRONE WILDER. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

WILDER, TYRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

 

Court Documents

Letter of Correspondence

11/28/2018 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Service Returned

01/17/2019 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

02/22/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

12/14/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790059AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2018 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:FERRERM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WILDER TYRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550083AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:ROSEN, JOSEPH F 806 S DOUGLAS RD SOUTH TOWER, SUITE 200 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3157 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less