This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/08/2019 at 22:36:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS SAMUEL F ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAMUEL F ORTIZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank USA NA

Defendant

ortiz, Samuel F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adams, Anson Andrew

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

06/10/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Final Disposition Document

05/24/2019 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

05/24/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

05/24/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Summons Returned - No Service

05/20/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

04/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

04/02/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

03/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

01/22/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

01/15/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

01/14/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

12/06/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31463:1344; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ortiz Samuel F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ortiz Samuel F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2530013AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/06/2018 REGISTER#:253CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ortiz Samuel F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560050AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:ADAMS, ANSON ANDREW 1315 WESTBROOK PLAZA DRIVESUITE 200 WINSTON-SALEM NC 27103 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.